NJ S576 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain notifications, and provides for guaranteed NJ Spill Compensation Fund coverage, upon sale of property where private well is treated by point of entry water treatment system.
Title
Requires certain notifications, and provides for guaranteed NJ Spill Compensation Fund coverage, upon sale of property where private well is treated by point of entry water treatment system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A936 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A936 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (59-11-3) |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A936/922 (ACS) |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-4) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A936 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - Substituted by S576 (1R)