NJ S532 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A1389 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A1389 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for uniform basic structure of taxicab fares in certain municipalities.
Title
Provides for uniform basic structure of taxicab fares in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A1389 (2R) |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1389 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S532 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S1000/532_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S1000/532_R1.HTM |