NJ S526 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S4113

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that purchase of insulin is not subject to deductible and requires health insurers to limit copayments and coinsurance for insulin.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that purchase of insulin is not subject to deductible and requires health insurers to limit copayments and coinsurance for insulin.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-11-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-11-16SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-11-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-27SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-01-27SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4113 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1669 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Combined with A954/653 (ACS)
A954 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback