NJ S511 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4223
Note: Carry Over of previous A6126
Note: Carry Over of previous S3311
Note: Carry Over of previous A6126
Note: Carry Over of previous S3311
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Substituted by A1474 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Substituted by A1474 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides certain protections and rights for temporary laborers.
Title
Provides certain protections and rights for temporary laborers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Reconsidered Vote (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Senate | Substituted by A1474 (1R) |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Reconsidered Vote (24-9) (Cryan) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-14) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4223 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A6126 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A1474 (Same As) 2023-02-06 - Approved P.L.2023, c.10.
S3311 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A6126 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A1474 (Same As) 2023-02-06 - Approved P.L.2023, c.10.
S3311 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee