NJ S508 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4145
Note: Carry Over of previous S2722
Note: Carry Over of previous A3887
Note: Carry Over of previous S2722
Note: Carry Over of previous A3887
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases maximum weekly benefit rate for temporary disability and family leave.
Title
Increases maximum weekly benefit rate for temporary disability and family leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4145 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2722 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by A4134 (1R)
A3887 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2722 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by A4134 (1R)
A3887 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Withdrawn from Consideration