NJ S489 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1829

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases amount of benefits under Work First New Jersey program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases amount of benefits under Work First New Jersey program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (38-1)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-03-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1829 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A30 (1R)
A3978 (Same As) 2018-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback