NJ S485 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S459
Note: Carry Over of previous S2790
Note: Carry Over of previous A4281
Note: Carry Over of previous S2790
Note: Carry Over of previous A4281
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school bus driver's complete motor vehicle driving record be shared with board of education or school bus contractor and local police.
Title
Requires school bus driver's complete motor vehicle driving record be shared with board of education or school bus contractor and local police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S485 (Carry Over) 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2790 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A2082 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A4281 (Carry Over) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2790 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A2082 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A4281 (Carry Over) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S485 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/485_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S485 |