NJ S469 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A361
Note: Carry Over of previous S3552
Note: Carry Over of previous S3552
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"P.I.C.K. Awareness Act"; authorizes issuance of special support recovery license plates.
Title
"P.I.C.K. Awareness Act"; authorizes issuance of special support recovery license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted by A268 |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S469 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A268
S3552 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A268 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.325.
S3552 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A268 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.325.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S469 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/469_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S469 |