NJ S452 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A2771 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A2771 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"The New Jersey Social Innovation Act"; establishes social innovation loan pilot program and study commission within EDA.
Title
"The New Jersey Social Innovation Act"; establishes social innovation loan pilot program and study commission within EDA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A2771 (1R) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2771 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.