NJ S422 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S236
Note: Carry Foward to future A3024
Note: Carry Over of previous S2761
Note: Carry Foward to future A3024
Note: Carry Over of previous S2761
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Office of Economic Research in Department of State.
Title
Establishes Office of Economic Research in Department of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-10 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S422 (Carry Over) 2016-11-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S422 (Carry Over) 2016-11-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2761 (Carry Over) 2015-02-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1246 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S422 (Carry Over) 2016-11-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2761 (Carry Over) 2015-02-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1246 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S422 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S0500/422_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S422 |