NJ S421 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S203
Note: Carry Foward to future A4118
Note: Carry Over of previous S340
Note: Carry Over of previous A5191
Note: Carry Foward to future A4118
Note: Carry Over of previous S340
Note: Carry Over of previous A5191
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Statewide targets to reduce disposal of organic waste in landfills; requires DEP to adopt regulations to achieve targets.
Title
Establishes Statewide targets to reduce disposal of organic waste in landfills; requires DEP to adopt regulations to achieve targets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S421 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S421 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S340 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A5191 (Carry Over) 2020-12-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A5191 (Same As) 2023-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S421 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S340 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A5191 (Carry Over) 2020-12-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A5191 (Same As) 2023-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee