NJ S4194 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6033
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6033
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Classifies golf caddies as independent contractors for purposes of State employment laws.
Title
Classifies golf caddies as independent contractors for purposes of State employment laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A6033 |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6033 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session