NJ S397 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1280
Note: Carry Foward to future A3473
Note: Carry Over of previous S2358
Note: Carry Over of previous S2358
Note: Carry Foward to future A3473
Note: Carry Over of previous S2358
Note: Carry Over of previous S2358
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to post information on sexual assaults on website and provide the information to prospective students.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to post information on sexual assaults on website and provide the information to prospective students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S397 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S397 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2358 (Carry Over) 2015-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2637 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2358 (Carry Over) 2016-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S397 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2358 (Carry Over) 2015-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2637 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2358 (Carry Over) 2016-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S397 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S0500/397_I1.HTM |