NJ S393 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S451
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A428 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A428 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands DNA database to include samples from disorderly persons who are fingerprinted and permits law enforcement officers to collect certain biological samples.
Title
Expands DNA database to include samples from disorderly persons who are fingerprinted and permits law enforcement officers to collect certain biological samples.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Gerald Cardinale [R] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A428 (ACS) |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S393 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A428 (ACS)
A428 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.263.
A428 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.263.