NJ S3883 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies procedure for change to manner of holding certain municipal elections.
Title
Modifies procedure for change to manner of holding certain municipal elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5404 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Transferred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5404 (Same As) 2019-07-12 - Approved P.L.2019, c.161.