NJ S385 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Substituted by A1368 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Substituted by A1368 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises penalty provisions for certain drunk driving violations, including use of and applicable time periods covering driver's license suspensions and installations of ignition interlock devices on motor vehicles.*
Title
Revises penalty provisions for certain drunk driving violations, including use of and applicable time periods covering driver's license suspensions and installations of ignition interlock devices on motor vehicles.*
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Substituted by A1368 (ACS/1R) |
2014-10-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1368 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/S385 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/S0500/385_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S385 |