NJ S3812 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5504 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5504 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applies 85 percent loss ratio requirement to certain large group health beneftis carriers. *
Title
Applies 85 percent loss ratio requirement to certain large group health beneftis carriers. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5504 (ACS/1R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5504 (Same As) 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.358.