NJ S368 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2852
Note: Carry Over of previous S4212
Note: Carry Over of previous S4212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipalities to require developers to make contributions for mass transit improvements.
Title
Permits municipalities to require developers to make contributions for mass transit improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S368 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S4212 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3544 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S4212 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3544 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S368 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/368_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S368 |