NJ S3634 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S614
Note: Carry Foward to future A557
Note: Carry Over of previous S3123
Note: Carry Over of previous A4584
Note: Carry Foward to future A557
Note: Carry Over of previous S3123
Note: Carry Over of previous A4584
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for disqualification from public office or employment upon conviction of certain crimes; creates registry.
Title
Establishes procedures for disqualification from public office or employment upon conviction of certain crimes; creates registry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3634 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3634 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1877 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3123 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4584 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3634 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1877 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3123 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4584 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S3634 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S4000/3634_I1.HTM |