NJ S3631 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A5340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A5340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credits for certain business headquarters located in State.
Title
Provides tax credits for certain business headquarters located in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted by A5340 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5340 (Same As) 2018-01-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.282.