NJ S3626 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A4914 (5R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A4914 (5R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Hospital at Home Act."
Title
Establishes "Hospital at Home Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Edward Durr [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A4914 (5R) |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4914 (Same As) 2023-09-25 - Approved P.L.2023, c.163.