NJ S3621 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3869
Note: Carry Over of previous S2567
Note: Carry Over of previous S2567
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits institutions of higher education and degree-granting proprietary institutions from using applications for admission that inquire about applicant's criminal history; establishes "Universal College Application Development Task Force" to develop standard application for admission.
Title
Prohibits institutions of higher education and degree-granting proprietary institutions from using applications for admission that inquire about applicant's criminal history; establishes "Universal College Application Development Task Force" to develop standard application for admission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3869 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2567 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A895 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2567 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A895 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S3621 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S4000/3621_I1.HTM |