NJ S3606 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3457
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5363 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5363 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires carriers that offer health benefits plans to provide new or existing subscribers with notification of certain hospital and health system contract expirations.
Title
Requires carriers that offer health benefits plans to provide new or existing subscribers with notification of certain hospital and health system contract expirations.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5363 (1R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3606 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5363 (1R)
A5363 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
A5363 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly