NJ S3592 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires electronic health records systems to meet requirements to accept, process, and transmit prescriptions for Schedule II controlled dangerous substance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires electronic health records systems to meet requirements to accept, process, and transmit prescriptions for Schedule II controlled dangerous substance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3831 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0)
2018-01-08AssemblySubstituted for A3831 (1R)
2018-01-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-01-05SenatePassed by the Senate (30-0)
2017-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-11-30SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3831 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3592 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback