NJ S3564 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2805
Note: Carry Foward to future S3166
Note: Carry Foward to future S3166
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies disabled veterans and Purple Heart recipients are not required to own vehicle to be exempt from municipal parking meter fees.
Title
Clarifies disabled veterans and Purple Heart recipients are not required to own vehicle to be exempt from municipal parking meter fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3564 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3564 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5125 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3564 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5125 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee