NJ S337 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S419
Note: Carry Foward to future A4131
Note: Carry Over of previous S2495
Note: Carry Over of previous A4008
Note: Carry Foward to future A4131
Note: Carry Over of previous S2495
Note: Carry Over of previous A4008
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Renewable and Efficient Energy Financing Program; authorizes BPU to transfer up to $20 million annually in societal benefits charge revenues to New Jersey Infrastructure Bank for purposes of program.
Title
Establishes Renewable and Efficient Energy Financing Program; authorizes BPU to transfer up to $20 million annually in societal benefits charge revenues to New Jersey Infrastructure Bank for purposes of program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S337 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S337 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2495 (Carry Over) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1976 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4008 (Carry Over) 2018-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S337 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2495 (Carry Over) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1976 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4008 (Carry Over) 2018-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee