NJ S3317 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-19-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires NJ to join U.S. Climate Alliance to uphold Paris Climate Accord.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires NJ to join U.S. Climate Alliance to uphold Paris Climate Accord.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5040 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-19-3)
2018-01-08AssemblySubstituted for A5040 (ACS)
2017-12-04AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-06-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2017-06-26SenatePassed by the Senate (25-14)
2017-06-15SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

A5040 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3317

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback