NJ S3317 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A2026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Realigning the transfer inheritance tax payment due date to coincide with the payment due dates for State and federal estate taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Realigning the transfer inheritance tax payment due date to coincide with the payment due dates for State and federal estate taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-11SenateSubstituted by A2026
2016-01-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2015-12-17SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2026 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback