NJ S331 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-01 - Substituted by A227 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-01 - Substituted by A227 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJT to hold public hearing and provide notice prior to any curtailment of certain bus and rail services.
Title
Requires NJT to hold public hearing and provide notice prior to any curtailment of certain bus and rail services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | Senate | Substituted by A227 (3R) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3204 (Carry Over) 2015-10-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A227 (Same As) 2016-09-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.52.
A227 (Same As) 2016-09-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.52.