NJ S3283 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Vetoed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns emergency unemployment benefits and shared work benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns emergency unemployment benefits and shared work benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5151 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04SenateAbsolute Veto, Received in the Senate
2020-12-17AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
2020-12-17AssemblySubstituted for A5151 (1R)
2020-12-17AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2020-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-12-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5151 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by S3283 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback