NJ S327 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S387

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits forum of consumer contract disputes to New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits forum of consumer contract disputes to New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S387 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1215 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback