NJ S3261 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A547

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A314 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Restricts use of isolated confinement in correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricts use of isolated confinement in correctional facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted by A314 (1R)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-06-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-06SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A314 (Same As) 2019-07-11 - Approved P.L.2019, c.160.
A547 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Substituted by S51 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback