NJ S3242 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Bars certain public officials from holding elective public office and participating in political activities for three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bars certain public officials from holding elective public office and participating in political activities for three years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-22SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2021-02-19SenateSenate Amendment (22-0) (Codey)
2021-01-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5402 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback