NJ S3206 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A4317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A4317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns violations of certain occupational licensing laws.
Title
Concerns violations of certain occupational licensing laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A4317 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4317 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.173.