NJ S3201 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1695
Note: Carry Foward to future S2291
Note: Carry Foward to future S2291
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires interior light of motor vehicle be turned on when stopped by law enforcement under certain circumstances.*
Title
Requires interior light of motor vehicle be turned on when stopped by law enforcement under certain circumstances.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3607 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-1-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A3607 (1R) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-12-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3201 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3201 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A3607 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3201 (1R)
S3201 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A3607 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3201 (1R)