NJ S3192 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S776
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public institution of higher education to offer course on stress management.
Title
Requires public institution of higher education to offer course on stress management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-15) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3192 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee