NJ S3185 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4748
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend additional sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend additional sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-26 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted by A4748
2018-11-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-29SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4748 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.30.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback