NJ S3183 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Criminalizes using drones to conduct surveillance of or fly over critical infrastructures; requires certain drones to be registered and insured.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminalizes using drones to conduct surveillance of or fly over critical infrastructures; requires certain drones to be registered and insured.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2016-01-11SenatePassed by the Senate (37-1)
2016-01-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2015-12-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2015-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2015-10-19SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4344 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Conaway)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback