NJ S3100 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S545
Note: Carry Foward to future A4015
Note: Carry Over of previous S3278
Note: Carry Over of previous A4926

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOC to provide prenatal and post-partum education and services for certain inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DOC to provide prenatal and post-partum education and services for certain inmates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3100 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3100 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4953 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3278 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4926 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback