NJ S3093 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes county-based mitigation plan to allow businesses to operate during pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes county-based mitigation plan to allow businesses to operate during pandemic.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-01-28SenatePassed by the Senate (33-0)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-11-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4910 (Same As) 2020-11-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback