NJ S3083 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A4467 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A4467 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that authorized persons and entities may administer a single dose of any opoid antidote, or multiple doses of any intranasal or intramuscular opioid antidote to overdose victims, with immunity under "Overdose Prevention Act." *
Title
Clarifies that authorized persons and entities may administer a single dose of any opoid antidote, or multiple doses of any intranasal or intramuscular opioid antidote to overdose victims, with immunity under "Overdose Prevention Act." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Senate | Substituted by A4467 (2R) |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4467 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)