NJ S3068 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development to establish apprenticeship mentoring program for women, minorities, and persons with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development to establish apprenticeship mentoring program for women, minorities, and persons with disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4829 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback