NJ S3056 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S705
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain notifications for termination of services to persons with developmental disabilities and providers.
Title
Requires certain notifications for termination of services to persons with developmental disabilities and providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A4420 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3056 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4420
A4420 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.304.
A4420 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.304.