NJ S3045 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4905
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4905
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows health insurers to provide certain health care benefit plans to local boards of education and eligible employers who do not participate in SEHBP; modifies employee contribution for New Jersey Educators Health Plan and its equivalent.
Title
Allows health insurers to provide certain health care benefit plans to local boards of education and eligible employers who do not participate in SEHBP; modifies employee contribution for New Jersey Educators Health Plan and its equivalent.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Senate | Substituted by A4905 |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4905 (Same As) 2020-12-18 - Approved P.L.2020, c.137.