NJ S3016 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S301
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits short-term tax exemption for certain improvements to dwellings damaged by natural disasters.
Title
Permits short-term tax exemption for certain improvements to dwellings damaged by natural disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3016 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A4657 (Same As) 2017-03-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A4657 (Same As) 2017-03-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee