NJ S3013 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits installation and sale of wheel weights containing lead or mercury; prohibits sale of new motor vehicles equipped with wheel weights containing lead or mercury.
Title
Prohibits installation and sale of wheel weights containing lead or mercury; prohibits sale of new motor vehicles equipped with wheel weights containing lead or mercury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted by A261 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A261 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.257.
A4201 (Carry Over) 2015-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4201 (Carry Over) 2015-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee