NJ S3012 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2286
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides temporary extension of certain documents issued by MVC.
Title
Provides temporary extension of certain documents issued by MVC.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-0) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment (22-0) (Turner) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3012 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A4866 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A4866 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee