NJ S299 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1193
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for fair notice and opportunity to contest, or obtain waiver of a repayment of, overpayment of homestead rebate or credit and homestead property tax reimbursement.
Title
Provides for fair notice and opportunity to contest, or obtain waiver of a repayment of, overpayment of homestead rebate or credit and homestead property tax reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S299 (Carry Over) 2016-05-12 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A2346 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A2346 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S299 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S0500/299_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S299 |