NJ S2976 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides standards for, and requires registration of, home elevation contractors.*
Title
Provides standards for, and requires registration of, home elevation contractors.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4394 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4394 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-1) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-5) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4394 (1R) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4394 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S2976 (2R)