NJ S2957 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2187
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes five-year moratorium on conversions of certain residential rental premises in qualified counties.
Title
Establishes five-year moratorium on conversions of certain residential rental premises in qualified counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4712 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (56-10-2) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4712 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-2) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2957 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4712 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2957 (1R)
A4712 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2957 (1R)